OK HB2128 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2128
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Torts; permitting liability for damages committed by a trespasser; effective date.
Title
Torts; permitting liability for damages committed by a trespasser; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-08 | House | Motion expired |
2017-05-03 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McBride |
2017-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 23 |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 23 |
2017-03-02 | House | General Order |
2017-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols |
2017-02-22 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative McBride |
2017-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2128 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017