OK HB2121 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; gross production tax; horizontal well exemptions; deep well exemptions; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; gross production tax; horizontal well exemptions; deep well exemptions; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Died in conference
2012-04-10 Conference granted, GCCA
2012-02-08 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources
2011-05-17 CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
2011-05-05 Conference granted, GCCA
2011-05-03 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources
2011-04-14 SA's received
2011-04-14 Engrossed to House
2011-04-13 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-13 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2011-04-13 Title restored
2011-04-13 General Order, Amended
2011-04-13 Senate Rule suspended
2011-03-31 coauthored by Ivester
2011-03-31 Title stricken
2011-03-31 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2011-03-15 Second Reading referred to Finance
2011-03-09 First Reading
2011-03-09 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-08 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 9
2011-03-08 General Order
2011-02-23 Authored by Senator Branan (principal Senate author)
2011-02-23 CR; Do Pass Energy and Utility Regulation Committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation
2011-02-07 Authored by Representative Hickman
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback