OK HB2101 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; Epinephrine pens at schools; effective date.
Title
Schools; Epinephrine pens at schools; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 31 Nays: 7 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 35 Nays: 3 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jolley |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 16 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 25 |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-02 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Public Health |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Jolley, Ford, Johnson (Rob), Stanislawski, Shumate, Paddack |
2013-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 18 |
2013-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer |
2013-03-05 | House | General Order |
2013-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Fourkiller |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |