OK HB2094 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2094
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; specifying penalty for disturbing legislative proceedings; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; specifying penalty for disturbing legislative proceedings; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2094 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee