OK HB2090 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2090
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; providing for the dismissal of arrest warrants and charges for failure to appear; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; providing for the dismissal of arrest warrants and charges for failure to appear; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 101 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-11 | House | Amended |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Hicks (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Bennett |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2090 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary