OK HB2089 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; plats; subdivisions; zoning; regulations; denial of applications; basis; appeals; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; plats; subdivisions; zoning; regulations; denial of applications; basis; appeals; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 12 |
2023-03-20 | House | Considered |
2023-03-20 | House | Laid over |
2023-03-20 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-20 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2023-03-20 | House | House Rule suspended |
2023-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |