OK HB2089 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-20 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

County jails; directing sheriff to reimburse health care providers according to the Oklahoma Medicaid Fee Schedule. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County jails; directing sheriff to reimburse health care providers according to the Oklahoma Medicaid Fee Schedule. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-20 Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs
2009-03-19 Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
2009-03-18 Second Reading referred to Appropriations
2009-03-11 First Reading
2009-03-11 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2009-03-10 Referred for engrossment
2009-03-10 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2
2009-03-10 Title stricken
2009-03-10 Amended
2009-03-10 Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author)
2009-03-10 General Order
2009-02-18 CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
2009-02-03 Second Reading referred to General Government
2009-02-02 Authored by Representative Kirby
2009-02-02 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19746New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback