OK HB2088 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; directing the State Board of Education to take steps to implement certain adopted standards by a certain school year; effective date.
Title
Schools; directing the State Board of Education to take steps to implement certain adopted standards by a certain school year; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Died in conference |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Ford, Stanislawski, Halligan, Smalley, Pittman, Paddack |
2015-05-06 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2015-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-05 | House | Amended |
2015-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2015-02-23 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |