OK HB2080 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Rejection of CCR rescinded
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Rejection of CCR rescinded
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Gangs; making certain acts unlawful; relating to seizure and forfeiture proceedings; authorizing forfeiture of property under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Gangs; making certain acts unlawful; relating to seizure and forfeiture proceedings; authorizing forfeiture of property under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Rejection of CCR rescinded | |
2009-05-21 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-05-20 | Title restored | |
2009-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-06 | HC's named: Wesselhoft, Duncan, Terrill, Morrissette, Inman | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-22 | SA's received | |
2009-04-22 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | |
2009-04-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-30 | coauthored by Blackwell, Cox, Liebmann, Pittman, Sears | |
2009-03-30 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-18 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Sears, Cox, Blackwell, Liebmann, Pittman | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 7 | |
2009-03-03 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Morrissette, Johnson | |
2009-03-03 | General Order | |
2009-02-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Wesselhoft | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1738 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 856 | New Code | See Bill Text |