OK HB2060 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2060
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; landscapers license; pesticide dealers permit; violation; penalty; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; landscapers license; pesticide dealers permit; violation; penalty; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 21 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Motion expired |
2023-03-20 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Roberts |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 72 |
2023-03-20 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-20 | House | Amended |
2023-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules |
2023-02-27 | House | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2060 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Motion expired