OK HB2055 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2055
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm suppressors; creating the Sportsman Hearing Protection Act; providing requirements for manufacturing firearm suppressors in Oklahoma; codification; emergency.
Title
Firearm suppressors; creating the Sportsman Hearing Protection Act; providing requirements for manufacturing firearm suppressors in Oklahoma; codification; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2055 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)