OK HB2049 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; Student Data Accessibility, Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013; clarifying statutory language; effective date.
Title
Schools; Student Data Accessibility, Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013; clarifying statutory language; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Ford, Halligan, Smalley, Sharp, Garrison, Wyrick |
2015-05-06 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2015-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | coauthored by Brumbaugh |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-05 | House | Amended |
2015-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3 | 168 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 169 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |