OK HB2040 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Entrepreneurial development; Oklahoma State Regents for Higher Education; small business development; minority enterprises; effective date; emergency.
Title
Entrepreneurial development; Oklahoma State Regents for Higher Education; small business development; minority enterprises; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Young |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |