OK HB2037 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Public Safety; deposit and expenditure of funds; allowing county sheriffs to collect certain fees; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Public Safety; deposit and expenditure of funds; allowing county sheriffs to collect certain fees; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by Governor 05/13/2019
2019-05-07HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-06HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-06HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2019-05-06HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-17HouseSA's received
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-27HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-26HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-26HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2019-02-26HouseAuthored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
2019-02-26HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Davis
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2037&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2037%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2037%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2037%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2037%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2037%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2037%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2037%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2037%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2037_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2037_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback