OK HB2032 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; relating to the Office of Juvenile System Oversight; specifying type of monitoring to be performed; modifying number of unannounced inspections of certain facilities; modifying certain duty. Effective date.
Title
Children; relating to the Office of Juvenile System Oversight; specifying type of monitoring to be performed; modifying number of unannounced inspections of certain facilities; modifying certain duty. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Kris Steele [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Approved by Governor 04/24/2009 | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-15 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-01 | coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-26 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-18 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Wright (Harold) | |
2009-03-03 | General Order | |
2009-02-23 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, McAffrey, Kern | |
2009-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |