OK HB2030 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public safety; creating the Silver Alert Act. Effective date.
Title
Public safety; creating the Silver Alert Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Approved by Governor 04/16/2009 | |
2009-04-13 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-13 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-09 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-08 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-08 | coauthored by Jolley, Leftwich, Stanislawski, Ivester | |
2009-04-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-25 | coauthored by Walker, Pittman | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-24 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman, Walker | |
2009-03-12 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Sears, Kern, Cooksey, Kiesel, Faught | |
2009-02-25 | General Order | |
2009-02-19 | Authored by Senator Coffee (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-19 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |