OK HB2027 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2027
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; hearing aids; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; hearing aids; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-09 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wolfley |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2027 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee