OK HB2010 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2010
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; authorizing the carry of concealed handguns on certain property; effective date.
Title
Firearms; authorizing the carry of concealed handguns on certain property; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-27 | House | General Order |
2019-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Mize |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2010 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019