OK HB2010 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring teachers to complete professional development training in personal financial literacy. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring teachers to complete professional development training in personal financial literacy. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Sen. Susan Paddack [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-03-09 | Conference granted, SCs named Paddack, Lamb, Ford, Jolley, Halligan, Reynolds, Branan | |
2010-03-04 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-05-12 | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-11 | HC's named: Coody, Miller, Jackson, Jones | |
2009-05-07 | Conference granted, SCs named Paddack, Ford, Jolley, Branan, Halligan, Reynolds | |
2009-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-13 | SA's received | |
2009-04-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-03-12 | First Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 10 | |
2009-03-11 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-11 | Amended | |
2009-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2009-03-11 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Coody | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |