OK HB2005 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Firefighters Pension and Retirement System; volunteers; eligibility; effective date.
Title
Public retirement systems; Firefighters Pension and Retirement System; volunteers; eligibility; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Pensions committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2015-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Sherrer, Cockroft, Hoskin |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Sanders |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |