OK HB2001 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Thompson, Ortega
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Thompson, Ortega
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax exemption for qualifying retirement income limits. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax exemption for qualifying retirement income limits. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Dank [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Rex Duncan [R] | Rep. Scott Inman [D] |
Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Thompson, Ortega | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-03-12 | First Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 25 | |
2009-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Inman, Kern, Duncan, Dank | |
2009-03-11 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Wright (Harold) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |