OK HB1996 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Failed in Committee - Retirement and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Failed in Committee - Retirement and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; modifying Insurance Adjusters Licensing Act; effective date.
Title
Insurance; modifying Insurance Adjusters Licensing Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Failed in Committee - Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-03-29 | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce committee | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 6 | |
2011-03-17 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Sullivan | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6202 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6203 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6205 | New Code | See Bill Text |