OK HB1995 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Counties and county offices; authorizing sheriff to keep certain audio or video recordings; directing to keep certain recordings for time certain; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties and county offices; authorizing sheriff to keep certain audio or video recordings; directing to keep certain recordings for time certain; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/23/2019
2019-05-20HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-20SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-20HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-17HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-17SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 7
2019-05-17SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-16SenateCCR read
2019-05-16HouseTo Senate
2019-05-16HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 25
2019-05-16HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-14HouseTitle restored
2019-05-14HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Shaw, Daniels, Paxton, Howard, Brooks, Floyd
2019-04-29HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on County and Municipal Government
2019-04-23HouseSA's received
2019-04-23SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 15
2019-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-09SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 31
2019-03-05HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-05HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseAuthored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author)
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Nollan
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1995&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1995%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1995%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1995%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1995%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1995%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1995%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1995%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1995_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1995_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback