OK HB1990 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Transportation; transportation and regional economic development authorities; modifying definition; effective date.
Title
Transportation; transportation and regional economic development authorities; modifying definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 3 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-18 | CCR read | |
2011-05-18 | To Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 10 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Title restored | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2011-04-27 | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Stanislawski, Treat, Crain, Eason McIntyre, Laster | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development | |
2011-04-14 | SA's received | |
2011-04-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 14 | |
2011-04-13 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-13 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-13 | Backed up to General Order | |
2011-04-13 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 25 Nays: 16 | |
2011-04-11 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Newberry | |
2011-04-11 | Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 23 | |
2011-04-11 | coauthored by Sparks | |
2011-04-11 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 13 | |
2011-03-17 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Sullivan | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 1370 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1705 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 5000 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 5001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 5002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 5003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |