OK HB1985 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1985
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Educators' Professional Liability Insurance Program; administered by Office of Management and Enterprise Services.
Title
Insurance; creating the Educators' Professional Liability Insurance Program; administered by Office of Management and Enterprise Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 15 |
2019-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad) |
2019-03-14 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Lepak |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1985 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee