OK HB1979 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-21 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Fourkiller
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Tourism and recreation; creating the Oklahoma Freedom Trail Act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourism and recreation; creating the Oklahoma Freedom Trail Act; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-15 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-21 Coauthored by Representative(s) Fourkiller
2012-05-21 CCR submitted
2012-05-03 Conference granted, SCs named Eason McIntyre, Coates, Allen, Wilson, Childers, Crain
2012-04-24 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2011-04-26 SA's received
2011-04-26 Engrossed to House
2011-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2011-04-25 General Order, Amended
2011-04-25 Senate Rule suspended
2011-04-25 Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2011-04-19 Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Eason McIntyre
2011-04-19 Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 25
2011-04-19 Title restored
2011-04-19 Enacting clause restored
2011-04-19 coauthored by Bennett
2011-04-19 coauthored by Allen
2011-04-19 General Order, Amended
2011-04-07 coauthored by Lockhart
2011-04-07 Enacting clause stricken
2011-04-07 Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2011-03-23 Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
2011-03-22 First Reading
2011-03-21 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-03-17 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-17 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 20
2011-03-17 Amended
2011-03-17 Authored by Senator Eason McIntyre (principal Senate author)
2011-03-17 Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton
2011-03-17 General Order
2011-03-03 Title stricken
2011-03-03 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2011-02-07 Authored by Representative Pittman
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
68236827Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback