OK HB1966 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1966
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; pesticide; applicator license; producer license; dealers license; permits; fees; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; pesticide; applicator license; producer license; dealers license; permits; fees; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2023 |
2023-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs |
2023-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-14 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Newton |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1966 (Carry Over) 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023