OK HB1928 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying scope of reciprocal agreement authority. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying scope of reciprocal agreement authority. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-12 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-23 | First Reading | |
2009-02-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1 | |
2009-02-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, Faught | |
2009-02-19 | General Order | |
2009-02-12 | Authored by Senator Corn (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-12 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Smithson | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |