OK HB1927 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1927
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying penalties for assault and battery and aggravated assault and battery upon medical care providers; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying penalties for assault and battery and aggravated assault and battery upon medical care providers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Weaver, Shaw, Paxton, Newhouse, Matthews, Brooks |
2019-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sanders |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 8 |
2019-03-06 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-06 | House | Amended |
2019-03-06 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Roe |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1927 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Died in conference