OK HB1923 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1923
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Telecommunications; maximum charges to certain connections to utility poles; electrical services; rural electric cooperatives; relocations; services; effective date.
Title
Telecommunications; maximum charges to certain connections to utility poles; electrical services; rural electric cooperatives; relocations; services; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2 |
2021-03-09 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Martinez |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1923 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism