OK HB1921 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1921
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation; modifying various provisions; effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; modifying various provisions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 25 |
2017-03-20 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-20 | House | Amended |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1921 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1250 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85A | 54 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |