OK HB1910 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1910
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; applying debt collection requirements to other service providers; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; applying debt collection requirements to other service providers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Approved by Governor 04/04/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Boles, McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1910 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019