OK HB1905 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher certification; teacher preparation programs; deleting reference; requiring teacher candidates to study trauma-informed responsive instruction; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher certification; teacher preparation programs; deleting reference; requiring teacher candidates to study trauma-informed responsive instruction; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by Governor 04/30/2019
2019-04-25HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-24HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-02SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Floyd
2019-03-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Kirt
2019-03-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Albright
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Phillips
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Miller
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Munson
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Rosecrants
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Sneed
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Pae
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Virgin
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Provenzano
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Fugate
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2
2019-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Tech
2019-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Conley
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback