OK HB1902 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; providing civil immunity for removing child from motor vehicle using forcible entry; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; providing civil immunity for removing child from motor vehicle using forcible entry; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-11 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-18HouseApproved by Governor 05/18/2015
2015-05-12HouseSent to Governor
2015-05-12SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2015-05-12HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2015-05-11HouseReferred for enrollment
2015-05-11HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
2015-05-11HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Matthews
2015-05-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Perryman
2015-05-11HouseSA's read, adopted
2015-04-16HouseSA's received
2015-04-16SenateEngrossed to House
2015-04-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-04-15SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2015-04-15SenateEmergency added
2015-04-15SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-03-24SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2015-03-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2015-03-03Senatecoauthored by Nollan
2015-02-12Senatecoauthored by Walker, Shelton, Matthews, Ritze, Cleveland
2015-02-12Senatecoauthored by Brooks
2015-02-12SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-02-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-02-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2015-02-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) O'Donnell, Lockhart
2015-02-11HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-05HouseAuthored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author)
2015-02-05HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Johnson
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47111120Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1902&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB1902%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB1902%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB1902%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB1902%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1902%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB1902%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1902_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1902_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback