OK HB1894 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1894
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; permitting certain classes in certain order of priority to make health care decisions for patient; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; permitting certain classes in certain order of priority to make health care decisions for patient; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 18 |
2017-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Calvey |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1894 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 3090 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3102 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3102 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |