OK HB1881 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal procedure; directing courts to issue orders of no contact to persons sentenced for certain crimes; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; directing courts to issue orders of no contact to persons sentenced for certain crimes; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseApproved by Governor 05/14/2019
2019-05-08HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-08SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-08HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-07HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-07HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2019-05-07HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-26SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
2019-03-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-27HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2019-02-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Burns, West (Josh)
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Judiciary
2019-02-25HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Fetgatter
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1881&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1881%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1881%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1881%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1881%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1881%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1881%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1881%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1881_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1881_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback