OK HB1878 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1878
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Waters and water rights; modifying boundaries of the Oklahoma River; effective date.
Title
Waters and water rights; modifying boundaries of the Oklahoma River; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tammy West [R] | Sen. Bill Coleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Motion expired |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Coleman |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 23 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 14 |
2021-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-02 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1878 (Carry Over) 2021-04-22 - Motion expired