OK HB1847 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; modifying child passenger restraint system requirements; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; modifying child passenger restraint system requirements; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 20 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22HouseApproved by Governor 06/05/2015
2015-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2015-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2015-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2015-05-22Senatecoauthored by Sparks
2015-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6
2015-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-21SenateCCR read
2015-05-21HouseTo Senate
2015-05-21HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2015-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 44
2015-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-19HouseTitle restored
2015-05-19HouseCCR submitted
2015-04-30SenateConference granted, SCs named Bass, Barrington, David, Brecheen, Sykes, Treat, Paddack
2015-04-28HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
2015-04-27HouseSA's received
2015-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2015-04-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-04-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 8
2015-04-22SenateTitle stricken
2015-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-04-22SenateBacked up to General Order
2015-04-22SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4
2015-04-22SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Bass
2015-04-22SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 22
2015-04-22SenateTitle restored
2015-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-04-09SenateTitle stricken
2015-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2015-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2015-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2015-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 40
2015-03-09HouseAmended
2015-03-09HouseHouse Rule suspended
2015-03-09HouseAmended
2015-03-09HouseConsidered
2015-03-05HouseLaid over
2015-03-05HouseHouse Rule suspended
2015-03-05HouseAmended
2015-03-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer
2015-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-12HouseAuthored by Senator Bass (principal Senate author)
2015-02-12HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Inman
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47111112New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1847&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB1847%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB1847%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB1847%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB1847%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1847%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1847%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB1847%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1847_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1847_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback