OK HB1837 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amusements and sports; relating to the Oklahoma Education Lottery Act; providing for disposition of net proceeds in excess of designated amount; requiring appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amusements and sports; relating to the Oklahoma Education Lottery Act; providing for disposition of net proceeds in excess of designated amount; requiring appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HouseApproved by Governor 05/02/2017
2017-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-04-25SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
2017-04-25SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2017-04-25SenateTitle restored
2017-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2017-04-12SenateTitle stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2017-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-08HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 25
2017-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-21HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2017-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie)
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3A7131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback