OK HB1821 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1821
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; increasing hours of mandatory training for reserve special agents; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; increasing hours of mandatory training for reserve special agents; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1821 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |