OK HB1818 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1818
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; authorizing Construction Industries Board to administer the Uniform Building Code Commission Act; repealer; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; authorizing Construction Industries Board to administer the Uniform Building Code Commission Act; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-02 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride |
2021-02-24 | House | Remove Representative McBride as principal House author and substitute with Representative Dempsey |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1818 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism