OK HB1811 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1811
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; directing courts to determine certain status of convicted persons prior to sentencing; codification; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; directing courts to determine certain status of convicted persons prior to sentencing; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-09 | House | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Blancett |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1811 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1811&Session=2100 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1811%20INT.PDF |