OK HB1784 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma Kratom Consumer Protection Act; requiring kratom vendors to disclose certain information on product label; prohibiting distribution to minors; codification; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma Kratom Consumer Protection Act; requiring kratom vendors to disclose certain information on product label; prohibiting distribution to minors; codification; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24HouseApproved by Governor 05/24/2021
2021-05-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-05-20SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-05-20HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-05-19HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-05-19SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
2021-05-19SenateCCR adopted
2021-05-17SenateCCR read
2021-05-17HouseTo Senate
2021-05-17HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
2021-05-17HouseCCR adopted
2021-05-13HouseTitle restored
2021-05-13HouseCCR submitted
2021-05-04SenateConference granted, SCs named Paxton, McCortney, Pugh, Garvin, Hicks, Dossett (J.A.)
2021-04-27HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
2021-04-26HouseSA's received
2021-04-26SenateEngrossed to House
2021-04-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-04-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
2021-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-04-05SenateTitle stricken
2021-04-05SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2021-03-02SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-02HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-01HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-01HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1
2021-03-01HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-11HouseAuthored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
2021-02-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Pae
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1784&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1784%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1784%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1784%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1784%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1784%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1784%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1784%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1784%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB1784%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1784%20FULLPCS1%20DANIEL%20PAE-GRS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1784%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1784%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1784%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1784%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1784%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1784%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20CCR%20SUMMARY/House/HB1784%20CCRSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1784%20CCS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1784_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1784_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback