OK HB1776 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; requiring certain candidates to file certain reports; requiring Ethics Commission to make certain report available online; effective date.
Title
State government; requiring certain candidates to file certain reports; requiring Ethics Commission to make certain report available online; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2011 | |
2011-04-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2011-04-20 | Title restored | |
2011-04-20 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-11 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5 | |
2011-03-16 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds | |
2011-03-16 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |