OK HB1741 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; relating to abuse or neglect, medical care, parental rights; authorizing a family drug court program. Effective date.
Title
Children; relating to abuse or neglect, medical care, parental rights; authorizing a family drug court program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Sen. Debbe Leftwich [D] | Rep. Steve Martin [R] | Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Rep. Ron Peters [R] |
Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] | Rep. Glen Smithson [D] | Sen. John Sparks [D] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-20 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2010-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-05 | CCR read | |
2010-05-05 | To Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-05 | CCR adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Title restored | |
2010-04-21 | CCR submitted | |
2010-03-10 | SCs named Burrage, Lamb, Coffee, Crain | |
2010-03-10 | Withdrawn from GCCA - granting conference | |
2010-02-23 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-02-04 | HC's named: Peters, Billy, Shumate, Liebmann, Cox, Shelton | |
2010-02-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-05-21 | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-07 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-05-05 | HC's named: Peters, Cox, Billy, Shumate, Shelton, Duncan | |
2009-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-20 | SA's received | |
2009-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-16 | coauthored by Garrison, Sparks | |
2009-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-02 | coauthored by Walker, Smithson, McAffrey, Tibbs, Martin (Steve) | |
2009-04-02 | coauthored by Gumm, Leftwich | |
2009-04-02 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-04-02 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Leftwich, Gumm | |
2009-03-27 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2009-03-20 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Walker, Smithson, McAffrey, Tibbs, Martin (Steve) | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-09 | Amended | |
2009-03-09 | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shumate, Shelton | |
2009-03-09 | General Order | |
2009-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 7009 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 843 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43A | 5 | 511 | New Code | See Bill Text |