OK HB1736 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Medicaid fraud; modifying Medicaid fraud procedure; effective date.
Title
Medicaid fraud; modifying Medicaid fraud procedure; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2011 | |
2011-04-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12 | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2011-04-20 | Title restored | |
2011-04-20 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-11 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-30 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-22 | First Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2011-02-21 | General Order | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-16 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Peterson | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1005 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 162 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |