OK HB1725 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; expanding permissible executive sessions; modifying definition of public body; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; expanding permissible executive sessions; modifying definition of public body; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22HouseDied in conference
2015-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Sykes, Jolley, Treat, Griffin, Marlatt, Matthews, Pittman
2015-04-28HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Oversight and Accountability
2015-04-27HouseSA's received
2015-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2015-04-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-04-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2015-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-04-07SenateEnacting clause stricken
2015-04-07SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2015-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2015-03-12Senatecoauthored by Perryman
2015-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2015-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 2
2015-03-05HouseTitle stricken
2015-03-05HouseAmended
2015-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author)
2015-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Osborn
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1725&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB1725%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1725%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB1725%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB1725%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB1725%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1725%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1725_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1725_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback