OK HB1721 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1721
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; relating to the Bus Passenger Safety Act; modifying certain definitions; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; relating to the Bus Passenger Safety Act; modifying certain definitions; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] | Rep. Greg Babinec [R] | Rep. Kevin Calvey [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-20 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen, Dahm |
2017-03-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Coody, Bennett (John), Calvey, Gann, Roberts (Sean), Jordan, McDugle, Ritze |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-02-16 | House | Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2017-02-16 | House | Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative Babinec |
2017-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1721 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety