OK HB1715 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Driver licenses for minors; repealing certain driver licenses and permit requirements; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver licenses for minors; repealing certain driver licenses and permit requirements; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseApproved by Governor 04/26/2021
2021-04-21HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-21SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-21HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-04-20HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-20SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-20SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
2021-04-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-29SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12
2021-03-08HouseAuthored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
2021-03-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Stearman
2021-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-24HouseEmergency added
2021-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Hill
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1715&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1715%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1715%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1715%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1715%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1715%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB1715%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1715%20FULLAMD1%20BRIAN%20HILL-AMM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1715%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1715%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1715%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1715_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1715_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback