OK HB1710 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1710
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; providing that hospitals and health plans shall not discriminate against physicians who have been awarded certification by certain specialty boards irrespective of recertification status or participation in certain certifications; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; providing that hospitals and health plans shall not discriminate against physicians who have been awarded certification by certain specialty boards irrespective of recertification status or participation in certain certifications; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 22 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-21 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ritze |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 71 |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-08 | House | Authored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Ritze |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1710 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Motion expired